US SB365 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to require a provider of a report to the CyberTipline related to online sexual exploitation of children to preserve the contents of such report for 180 days, and for other purposes.
Title
END Child Exploitation Act Eliminate Network Distribution of Child Exploitation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7304) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6548 Amendment SA 6548 proposed by Senator Kelly for Senator Blackburn. (consideration: CR S7304; text: CR S7304) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6548 Amendment SA 6548 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7304) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB807 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1198 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB223 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6544 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB3538 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB1198 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB223 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6544 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB3538 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.