US SB3649 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 674.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 674.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
First Step Act This bill amends various provisions of law and sets forth new provisions: to require the Department of Justice to establish and the Bureau of Prisons (BOP) to implement a risk and needs assessment system; to modify the computation of good time credit; to allow federal correctional officers to securely store and carry concealed firearms on BOP premises outside the security perimeter of a prison; to limit the use of restraints on federal prisoners who are pregnant or in postpartum recovery; to reduce mandatory minimum prison terms for certain nonviolent repeat drug offenses; to broaden the existing safety valve to permit a sentence below the mandatory minimum for certain nonviolent, cooperative drug offenders with a limited criminal history; to make the Fair Sentencing Act of 2010 retroactive; to require prisoners to be placed within 500 miles of their primary residence; to require low-risk prisoners to be placed on home confinement for the maximum amount of time permitted; to reauthorize through FY2022 and modify eligibility for an elderly offender early release pilot program; to require the BOP to help prisoners obtain identification documents prior to release, to incorporate de-escalation procedures into training programs, and to make tampons and sanitary napkins available free of charge; to authorize Federal Prison Industries to sell products to additional markets; to require probation and pretrial services officers to perform court-directed supervision of sex offenders conditionally released from civil commitment; to require the BOP to establish pilot programs on youth mentorship and service to abandoned, rescued, or vulnerable animals; and to limit juvenile solitary confinement.
Title
First Step Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-26 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 674. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB613 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5682 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Received in the Senate.
SB1084 (Related) 2017-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2471 (Related) 2018-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2795 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR 5/9/2018 S2580-2581; text of measure as introduced: CR S2518-2527)
SB756 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
SB3747 (Related) 2018-12-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 731.
HB5682 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Received in the Senate.
SB1084 (Related) 2017-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2471 (Related) 2018-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2795 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR 5/9/2018 S2580-2581; text of measure as introduced: CR S2518-2527)
SB756 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
SB3747 (Related) 2018-12-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 731.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3649/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3649/BILLS-115s3649pcs.pdf |