US HB613 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Lieutenant Osvaldo Albarati Correctional Officer Self-Protection Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal criminal code to require the Bureau of Prisons (BOP) to allow a correctional officer at a federal prison or correctional institution to: (1) store firearms on BOP premises in a secure storage area outside the security perimeter of the institution or in a vehicle lockbox, and (2) carry a concealed firearm on BOP premises outside the security perimeter of the institution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lieutenant Osvaldo Albarati Correctional Officer Self-Protection Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 181 (Y: 378 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2018-05-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-05-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 0 (Roll no. 181). (text: CR H3955)
2018-05-15HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3955-3956)
2018-05-15HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2018-05-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 613.
2018-05-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3940-3942)
2018-05-15HouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2018-05-15HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 519.
2018-05-15HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-674.
2017-04-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-04-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-02-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2017-01-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1084 (Related) 2017-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1994 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6646-6655)
HB3356 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB2795 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR 5/9/2018 S2580-2581; text of measure as introduced: CR S2518-2527)
HB5682 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Received in the Senate.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback