US SB3623 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 268.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 268.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the Violence Against Women Act of 1994, and for other purposes.
Title
Kayden’s Law Keeping Children Safe From Family Violence Act SANE Act Supporting Access to Nurse Exams Act Fairness for Rape Kit Backlog Survivors Act of 2022 Bree’s Law Choose Respect Act Closing the Law Enforcement Consent Loophole Act of 2022 NICS Denial Notification Act of 2022 SIMARRA Act Stop Infant Mortality And Recidivism Reduction Act Ramona Brant Improvement of Conditions for Women in Federal Custody Act Abby Honold Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 268. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S614-615) |
Same As/Similar To
SB675 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3648 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6294 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1339 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2364 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6735 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3648 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6294 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1339 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2364 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6735 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3623/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3623/BILLS-117s3623pcs.pdf |