US SB3612 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-12-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act to provide that tax deductions for ordinary business expenses and other tax incidents shall not be affected by the exclusion from gross income of amounts related to loan forgiveness received in response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).
Title
Small Business Expense Protection Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3596 (Related) 2020-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6821 (Same As) 2020-05-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6884 (Related) 2020-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6821 (Same As) 2020-05-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6884 (Related) 2020-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Small business
Taxation
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Small business
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3612/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3612/BILLS-116s3612is.pdf |