US SB3455 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to prohibit the implementation of new requirements to report bank account deposits and withdrawals.
Title
Prohibiting IRS Financial Surveillance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5586 (Related) 2021-10-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB3056 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3056 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3455/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3455/BILLS-117s3455pcs.pdf |