US SB3442 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-314.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-314.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 105 Duff Street in Macon, Missouri, as the "Arla W. Harrell Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 105 Duff Street in Macon, Missouri, as the "Arla W. Harrell Post Office."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 105 Duff Street in Macon, Missouri, as the "Arla W. Harrell Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-314. |
2018-12-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-06 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9729) |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9729) |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-11-29 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-11-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-11-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-11-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7063; text: CR S7063) |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 591. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Missouri
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Missouri
Postal service