US SB3381 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Bureau of Indian Affairs to process and complete all mortgage packages associated with residential and business mortgages on Indian land by certain deadlines, and for other purposes.
Title
Tribal Trust Land Homeownership Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 590. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-232. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text: CR S9162-9164) |