US SB312 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Carson National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2013 - Adjusts the boundary of the Carson National Forest in New Mexico to incorporate approximately 4,990 acres of land identified as the Miranda Canyon Boundary.
Title
Carson National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-58. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-28. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB663 (Related) 2013-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.