US SB3083 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3984)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3984)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Career and Technical Education for Adult Learners Act of 2018
Title
Career and Technical Education for Adult Learners Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3984) |
Same As/Similar To
SB3101 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2155 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3137 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB945 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2555)
HB2155 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3137 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB945 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2555)
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Education
Educational technology and distance education
Performance measurement
Vocational and technical education
Education
Educational technology and distance education
Performance measurement
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3083/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3083/BILLS-115s3083is.pdf |