US SB945 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2555)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2555)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
New HOPE Act New Hope and Opportunity through the Power of Employment Act This bill amends the Carl D. Perkins Career and Technical Education Act of 2006 to require state leadership activities funded by the Act to include consulting and coordinating with other state agencies for the identification, consolidation, or elimination of licenses or certifications that pose an unnecessary barrier to entry for aspiring workers and provide limited consumer protection.
Title
New HOPE Act New Hope and Opportunity through the Power of Employment Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2555) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2155 (Same As) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB628 (Related) 2017-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1806-1807)
SB3101 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6623 (Related) 2018-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB2353 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-224.
SB3083 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3984)
SB3129 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB628 (Related) 2017-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1806-1807)
SB3101 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6623 (Related) 2018-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB2353 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-224.
SB3083 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3984)
SB3129 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Education
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
Vocational and technical education
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/945/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s945/BILLS-115s945is.pdf |