US HB3137 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting Women in STEM Act This bill amends the Carl D. Perkins Career and Technical Education Act of 2006 to require state leadership activities under the Act to include supporting programs that increase the participation of women in career and technical education programs leading to occupations in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.
Title
Promoting Women in STEM Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3101 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6623 (Related) 2018-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB2353 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-224.
SB3083 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3984)
SB3217 (Related) 2018-12-19 - By Senator Alexander from Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions filed written report. Report No. 115-434.
HB6623 (Related) 2018-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB2353 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-224.
SB3083 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3984)
SB3217 (Related) 2018-12-19 - By Senator Alexander from Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions filed written report. Report No. 115-434.
Subjects
Education programs funding
Labor and employment
Science and engineering education
Vocational and technical education
Women's education
Women's employment
Labor and employment
Science and engineering education
Vocational and technical education
Women's education
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3137/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3137/BILLS-115hr3137ih.pdf |