US SB3217 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - By Senator Alexander from Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions filed written report. Report No. 115-434.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - By Senator Alexander from Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions filed written report. Report No. 115-434.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening Career and Technical Education for the 21st Century Act
Title
Strengthening Career and Technical Education for the 21st Century Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | By Senator Alexander from Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions filed written report. Report No. 115-434. |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517. |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Alexander. Without written report. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2353 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-224.
HB4387 (Related) 2017-11-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3137 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB653 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB790 (Related) 2017-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3101 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4387 (Related) 2017-11-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB3137 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB653 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB790 (Related) 2017-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3101 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Performance measurement
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Performance measurement
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3217/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3217/BILLS-115s3217pcs.pdf |