US SB3041 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 737.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 737.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster Recovery Reform Act of 2018
Title
Disaster Recovery Reform Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 737. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-446. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB1183 (Related) 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB1678 (Related) 2017-05-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1735 (Related) 2017-11-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.
HB4455 (Related) 2017-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
SB3055 (Related) 2018-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1183 (Related) 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB1678 (Related) 2017-05-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1735 (Related) 2017-11-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.
HB4455 (Related) 2017-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
SB3055 (Related) 2018-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.