US HB1183 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wildfire Prevention Act of 2017 This bill amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to authorize the President to provide hazard mitigation assistance in any area affected by a fire for which fire management assistance was provided under such Act, regardless of whether a major disaster is declared. Recipients of hazard mitigation assistance may use such assistance to conduct the following activities to help reduce the risk of future damage, hardship, loss, or suffering in any area affected by a wildfire: reseeding ground cover with quick-growing or native species; mulching with straw or chipped wood; constructing straw, rock, or log dams in small tributaries to prevent flooding; placing logs and other erosion barriers to catch sediment on hill slopes; installing debris traps to modify road and trail drainage mechanisms; modifying or removing culverts to allow drainage to flow freely; adding drainage dips and constructing emergency spillways to keep roads and bridges from washing out during floods; planting grass to prevent the spread of noxious weeds; installing warning signs; establishing defensible space measures; and reducing hazardous fuels. The Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) shall submit to specified congressional committees a report containing a summary of any projects carried out, and any funding provided to those projects, under this bill.
Title
Wildfire Prevention Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4460 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 850.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
SB3041 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 737.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
SB3041 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 737.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Horticulture and plants
Lakes and rivers
Roads and highways
Dams and canals
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Horticulture and plants
Lakes and rivers
Roads and highways
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1183/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1183/BILLS-115hr1183ih.pdf |