US HB4455 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SMART Rebuilding Act Supporting Mitigation Activities and Resiliency Targets for Rebuilding Act This bill amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to authorize the President to provide incentives to invest in measures that increase readiness for, and resilience from, a major disaster. The Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) must issue comprehensive guidance on measures and investments that will be recognized for the purpose of increasing the federal share of disaster assistance. The bill authorizes the President to: (1) establish a National Public Infrastructure Predisaster Mitigation Fund which may be used for activities to implement design standards to protect the welfare of buildings' users against disasters, and (2) contribute to state and local governments for their associated expenses which shall include base and overtime wages for extra hires to facilitate the implementation and enforcement of adopted building codes for a period of not more than 180 days after the major disaster is declared. The President may contribute up to 75% of the cost of hazard mitigation measures determined to be cost-effective and which substantially reduce the risk of, or increase resilience to, future damage, hardship, loss, or suffering in any area affected by a major disaster.
Title
SMART Rebuilding Act Supporting Mitigation Activities and Resiliency Targets for Rebuilding Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-11-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-11-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4460 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 850.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
SB3041 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 737.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
SB3041 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 737.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Infrastructure development
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Infrastructure development
State and local finance
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4455/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4455/BILLS-115hr4455ih.pdf |