US SB3036 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6-1)
Status: Passed on January 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-375.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6-1)
Status: Passed on January 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-375.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Alzheimer's Project Act - (Sec. 2) Establishes in the Office of the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) the National Alzheimer's Project. Requires the Secretary to: (1) be responsible for the creation and maintenance of an integrated national plan to overcome Alzheimer's; (2) provide information and coordination of Alzheimer's research and services across all federal agencies; (3) accelerate the development of treatments that would prevent, halt, or reverse the course of Alzheimer's; (4) improve the early diagnosis of Alzheimer's disease and coordination of the care and treatment of citizens with Alzheimer's; (5) ensure the inclusion of ethnic and racial populations at higher risk for Alzheimer's, or least likely to receive care for Alzheimer's, in clinical, research, and service efforts with the purpose of decreasing health disparities in Alzheimer's; and (6) coordinate with international bodies to integrate and inform the fight against Alzheimer's globally. Directs the Secretary to:(1) use discretionary authority to evaluate all federal programs around Alzheimer's, including budget requests and approvals; and (2) annually assess the nation's progress in preparing for the escalating burden of Alzheimer's. Establishes an Advisory Council on Alzheimer's Research, Care, and Services to advise the Secretary and provide the Secretary and Congress with: (1) an initial evaluation of all federally -funded efforts in Alzheimer's research, clinical care, and institutional-, home-, and community-based programs and their outcomes; (2) initial recommendations for priority actions to expand, eliminate, coordinate, or condense programs based on their performance, mission, and purpose; (3) initial recommendations to improve health outcomes and reduce the financial impact of Alzheimer's on Medicare and other federally-funded programs and on families living with Alzheimer's disease; and (4) an annual evaluation of the implementation and outcomes of the recommendations through an updated national plan. Terminates the Advisory Council on December 31, 2025. Directs federal agencies to share Alzheimer's data with the Secretary. Sets forth reporting requirements. Terminates the Project on December 31, 2025.
Title
National Alzheimer's Project Act
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Akaka [D-HI] | Sen. Evan Bayh [D-IN] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kent Conrad [D-ND] |
Sen. Christopher Dodd [D-CT] | Sen. Russell Feingold [D-WI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Judd Gregg [R-NH] |
Sen. Daniel Inouye [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Edward Kaufman [D-DE] | Sen. Herb Kohl [D-WI] |
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. George LeMieux [R-FL] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] |
Sen. Blanche Lincoln [D-AR] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-04 | Became Public Law No: 111-375. | |
2011-01-04 | Signed by President. | |
2010-12-28 | Presented to President. | |
2010-12-15 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-12-15 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-12-15 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8369) | |
2010-12-15 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3036. | |
2010-12-15 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8369-8372) | |
2010-12-15 | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2010-12-08 | Held at the desk. | |
2010-12-08 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-12-08 | Received in the House. | |
2010-12-08 | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8654-8655; text as passed Senate: CR S8654-8655) | |
2010-12-06 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 675. | |
2010-12-06 | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. | |
2010-12-01 | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. | |
2010-02-24 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4689 (Same As) 2010-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB1555 (Related) 2009-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1555 (Related) 2009-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aging
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
International organizations and cooperation
Medical research
Minority health
Neurological disorders