US SB3021 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-270.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018 This bill designates the U.S. courthouse at 300 South Fourth Street in Minneapolis, Minnesota, as the "Diana E. Murphy United States Courthouse."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-10 - Senate - Senate agreed in the House amendments to S. 3021 RC# 225 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendments to S. 3021 RC# 224 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-23HouseBecame Public Law No: 115-270.
2018-10-23HouseSigned by President.
2018-10-12HousePresented to President.
2018-10-11HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-10-10HouseSenate agreed to the House amendments to S. 3021 by Yea-Nay Vote. 99 - 1. Record Vote Number: 225.
2018-10-10HouseS.Amdt.4049 SA 4049 fell when SA 4048 withdrawn.
2018-10-10HouseS.Amdt.4048 Proposed amendment SA 4048 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S6747)
2018-10-10HouseMotion by Senator McConnell to concur in the House amendment to S. 3021 with an amendment (SA 4048) was withdrawn.
2018-10-10HouseS.Amdt.4049 Considered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S6747)
2018-10-10HouseS.Amdt.4048 Considered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S6747)
2018-10-10HouseConsidered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S6747)
2018-10-09HouseS.Amdt.4052 SA 4052 fell when SA 4051 fell.
2018-10-09HouseS.Amdt.4051 SA 4051 fell when SA 4050 fell.
2018-10-09HouseS.Amdt.4050 SA 4050 fell when cloture invoked on the motion to concur in the House amendments to S. 3021.
2018-10-09HouseMotion by Senator McConnell to refer to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works the House message to accompany S. 3021 with instructions to report back forthwith with the following amendment (SA 4050) fell when cloture was invoked on the motion to concur in the House amendments to S. 3021 in Senate.
2018-10-09HouseCloture on the motion to concur in the House amendments to S. 3021 invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 3. Record Vote Number: 224. (CR S6714-6715)
2018-10-09HouseS.Amdt.4052 Considered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S6703)
2018-10-09HouseS.Amdt.4051 Considered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S6703)
2018-10-09HouseS.Amdt.4050 Considered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S6703)
2018-10-09HouseS.Amdt.4049 Considered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S6703)
2018-10-09HouseS.Amdt.4048 Considered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S6703)
2018-10-09HouseConsidered by Senate (Message from the House considered). (consideration: CR S6703-6719)
2018-10-06HouseS.Amdt.4052 Amendment SA 4052 proposed by Senator McConnell to Amendment SA 4051. (consideration: CR S6698; text: CR S6698) Of a perfecting nature.
2018-10-06HouseS.Amdt.4051 Amendment SA 4051 proposed by Senator McConnell to Amendment SA 4050 (the instructions of the motion to refer). (consideration: CR S6698; text: CR S6698) Of a perfecting nature.
2018-10-06HouseS.Amdt.4050 Amendment SA 4050 proposed by Senator McConnell. (consideration: CR S6698; text: CR S6698) To change the enactment date.
2018-10-06HouseMotion by Senator McConnell to refer to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works the House message to accompany S. 3021 with instructions to report back forthwith with the following amendment (SA 4050) made in Senate.
2018-10-06HouseS.Amdt.4049 Amendment SA 4049 proposed by Senator McConnell to Amendment SA 4048. (consideration: CR S6698; text: CR S6698) Of a perfecting nature.
2018-10-06HouseS.Amdt.4048 Amendment SA 4048 proposed by Senator McConnell. (consideration: CR S6698; text: CR S6698) To change the enactment date.
2018-10-06HouseMotion by Senator McConnell to concur in the House amendment to S. 3021 with an amendment (SA 4048) made in Senate.
2018-10-06HouseCloture motion on the motion to concur in the House amendments to S. 3021 presented in Senate. (CR S6697-6698)
2018-10-06HouseMotion by Senator McConnell to concur in the House amendments to S. 3021 made in Senate.
2018-10-06HouseMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6697-6698)
2018-09-17HouseMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
2018-09-13HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-13HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8185-8221)
2018-09-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3021.
2018-09-13HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8184-8228)
2018-09-13HouseMr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-09-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
2018-09-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2018-09-05HouseReceived in the House.
2018-09-05SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-09-04SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6032; text: CR S6032)
2018-08-01SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 550.
2018-08-01SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
2018-08-01SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-06-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB6244 (Same As) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Alabama
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Aquatic ecology
Arizona
Arkansas
Army Corps of Engineers
Atmospheric science and weather
Buy American requirements
California
Child care and development
Child health
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Connecticut
Dams and canals
Disaster relief and insurance
Educational facilities and institutions
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Everglades
Floods and storm protection
Florida
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Illinois
Indian lands and resources rights
Iowa
Kansas
Kentucky
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Long Island Sound
Louisiana
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Massachusetts
Metals
Minnesota
Mississippi River
Missouri
Missouri River
Natural disasters
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New Hampshire
New Jersey
New York City
New York State
North Dakota
Oregon
Rhode Island
Seashores and lakeshores
Solid waste and recycling
Technology assessment
Tennessee
Texas
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
Vermont
Virginia
Washington State
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wisconsin
Wyoming

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback