US HB3906 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Innovative Stormwater Infrastructure Act of 2018 This bill requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to provide grants to eligible higher education institutions and research institutions to establish and maintain between three and five centers of excellence for innovative stormwater control infrastructure, which is any green stormwater management technique that: (1) uses natural systems or engineered systems that mimic natural processes to infiltrate, evapotranspire, or capture stormwater; and (2) preserves, enhances, or mimics natural hydrology to protect or restore water quality. One of the centers must be the national electronic clearinghouse center and operate a website and a public database on the infrastructure. In addition, the EPA must provide grants to state, tribal, or local governments or entities that manage stormwater, drinking water resources, or wastewater resources for innovative stormwater control infrastructure projects. The EPA must ensure that: (1) EPA's Office of Water, Office of Enforcement and Compliance, Office of Research and Development, and Office of Policy promote the use of the infrastructure in, and coordinate the integration of, permitting programs, planning efforts, research, technical assistance, and funding guidance; and (2) the Office of Water supports establishing innovative financing mechanisms in the implementation of the infrastructure. The EPA must: (1) direct each EPA regional office to promote and integrate the use of the infrastructure within the region, and (2) promote sharing information about the infrastructure approaches. The EPA must establish the innovative stormwater control infrastructure portfolio standard of voluntary, measurable goals to increase the percentage of annual water managed by entities that use the infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Innovative Stormwater Infrastructure Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2018-07-16HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6219)
2018-07-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3906.
2018-07-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6219-6221)
2018-07-16HouseMr. Graves (LA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-07-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 641.
2018-07-16HouseCommittee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
2018-07-16HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-828, Part I.
2018-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-06-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-06-27HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
2018-05-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2017-10-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2017-10-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-10-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-10-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1695 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB6944 (Related) 2018-09-27 - Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback