US HB5827 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dam Safety Reauthorization Act This bill reauthorizes the National Dam Safety Program through FY2024.
Title
Dam Safety Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8 (Related) 2018-06-26 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 488.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
SB3021 (Related) 2018-10-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-270.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
SB3021 (Related) 2018-10-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-270.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5827/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5827/BILLS-115hr5827ih.pdf |