US SB298 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to regulate large capacity ammunition feeding devices.
Title
Keep Americans Safe Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Sen. Laphonza Butler [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Related) 2023-01-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S55)
HB625 (Related) 2023-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB698 (Related) 2023-06-05 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mrs. McBath asked unanimous consent that she may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 698, a bill originally introduced by Representative Cicilline, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
HB625 (Related) 2023-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB698 (Related) 2023-06-05 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mrs. McBath asked unanimous consent that she may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 698, a bill originally introduced by Representative Cicilline, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/298/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s298/BILLS-118s298is.pdf |