US SB2979 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 634.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 634.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve drug testing for transportation-related activities.
Title
Preventing Opioid and Drug Impairment in Transportation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 634. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-328. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3888 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Canada
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Latin America
Licensing and registrations
Mexico
Pipelines
Railroads
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Canada
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Latin America
Licensing and registrations
Mexico
Pipelines
Railroads
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security