US SB2873 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-270.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-270.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
ECHO Act Expanding Capacity for Health Outcomes Act This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), in collaboration with the Health Resources and Services Administration, to study technology-enabled collaborative learning and capacity building models and the ability of those models to improve patient care and provider education. (Such models connect specialists to primary care providers through videoconferencing to facilitate case-based learning, dissemination of best practices, and evaluation of outcomes.) The Government Accountability Office must report on such models and HHS support for such models.
Title
ECHO Act Expanding Capacity for Health Outcomes Act
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-29 - Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2873 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2873 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2873 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-270. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-08 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7198) |
2016-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2873. |
2016-12-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7198-7199) |
2016-12-06 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-11-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2016-11-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 154. |
2016-11-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.5110 Amendment SA 5110 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-11-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.5110 Amendment SA 5110 proposed by Senator Daines for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S6525-6526; text: CR S6525-6526) |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6525-6526) |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5395 (Same As) 2016-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical education
Mental health
Rural conditions and development
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical education
Mental health
Rural conditions and development
Women's health