US SB2755 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-156. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-156. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fallen Heroes Flag Act of 2016 (Sec. 3) This bill allows the Representative or Senator of an immediate family member of a deceased firefighter, law enforcement officer, member of a rescue squad or ambulance crew, or public safety officer who died in the line of duty to give the family, on request, a Capitol-flown flag, together with a certificate, signed by the official providing the flag (the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Representative, or the President pro tempore of the Senate and the Senator), that contains an expression of sympathy for the family.
Title
Fallen Heroes Flag Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-156. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-05-16 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-05-13 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2164-2165) |
2016-05-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2755. |
2016-05-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2164-2166) |
2016-05-10 | House | Mr. Nugent moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-04-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2016-04-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2202) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2201-2202) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB723 (Related) 2015-05-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional tributes
First responders and emergency personnel
Law enforcement officers
National symbols
U.S. Capitol
Congressional tributes
First responders and emergency personnel
Law enforcement officers
National symbols
U.S. Capitol