US HB723 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fallen Heroes Flag Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Allows the Representative of the immediate family of a deceased fire fighter, law enforcement officer, member of a rescue squad or ambulance crew, or public safety officer who died in the line of duty to provide the family, at their request, with a Capitol-flown flag, together with a certificate, signed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Representative providing the flag, which contains an expression of sympathy for the family. (Sec. 4) Authorizes appropriations for FY2015-FY2020 to carry out this Act, to be derived from amounts appropriated for the operation of the Capitol Visitors Center, subject to a cap.
Title
Fallen Heroes Flag Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-05-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2856) |
2015-05-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 723. |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2856-2857) |
2015-05-12 | House | Mr. Nugent moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2755 (Related) 2016-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-156. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congress
Congressional tributes
First responders and emergency personnel
Law enforcement officers
National symbols
U.S. Capitol
Congressional tributes
First responders and emergency personnel
Law enforcement officers
National symbols
U.S. Capitol