US SB2674 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize funding for programs to prevent, investigate, and prosecute elder abuse, neglect, and exploitation, and for other purposes.
Title
Elder Justice Reauthorization and Modernization Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4969 (Related) 2021-08-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5005 (Related) 2021-08-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB5094 (Related) 2021-08-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB5241 (Related) 2021-09-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB5005 (Related) 2021-08-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB5094 (Related) 2021-08-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB5241 (Related) 2021-09-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2674/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2674/BILLS-117s2674is.pdf |