US SB2539 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Traumatic Brain Injury Reauthorization Act of 2014 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize through FY2019 traumatic brain injury (TBI) prevention and surveillance or registry programs. (Sec. 3) Reauthorizes through FY2019 the programs of grants to states and Indian consortia for TBI services, and protection and advocacy systems to provide services to individuals with TBI. (Sec. 5) Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop a plan for the improved coordination of federal activities with respect to TBI that will: review interagency coordination efforts; identify areas for improved coordination between federal agencies and programs, including those with a focus on serving individuals with disabilities; identify adopted recommendations from the report on development and improvement of TBI diagnostic tools and treatments and describe plans to address each recommendation that has not been adopted; and incorporate feedback from stakeholders, including individuals with TBI and their caregivers. (Sec. 6) Directs the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to review the scientific evidence related to brain injury management in children and identify opportunities for research.
Title
Traumatic Brain Injury Reauthorization Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-196. |
2014-11-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-11-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-13 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7964) |
2014-11-13 | House | Mr. Latta asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2014-11-13 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7964) |
2014-09-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-09-17 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-09-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5643; text as passed Senate: CR S5643) |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 483. |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2014-07-07 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4214) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Elementary and secondary education
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
School athletics
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Elementary and secondary education
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
School athletics