US SB252 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Drug Savings Act of 2017 This bill requires drug manufacturers to issue rebates to the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) for prescription drugs dispensed to eligible low-income individuals under the Medicare prescription drug benefit or a Medicare Advantage (MA) prescription drug plan (PDP). Subject to civil monetary penalties, a Medicare or MA PDP sponsor must report, both to drug manufacturers and to the CMS, specified information related to the determination and payment of such rebates.
Title
Medicare Drug Savings Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1511 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1776 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB771 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4138 (Related) 2017-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3411 (Related) 2018-09-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1776 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB771 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4138 (Related) 2017-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3411 (Related) 2018-09-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/252/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s252/BILLS-115s252is.pdf |