US SB3411 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on September 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Affordable Medications Act
Title
Affordable Medications Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3194 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1245 (Related) 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1776 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6340 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB252 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB469 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB771 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2476 (Related) 2018-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2478 (Related) 2018-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1245 (Related) 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1776 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6340 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB252 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB469 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB771 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2476 (Related) 2018-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2478 (Related) 2018-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3411/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3411/BILLS-115s3411is.pdf |