US HB4138 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Drug Price Negotiation Act
Title
Medicare Drug Price Negotiation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-10-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2011 (Same As) 2017-10-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1511 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB252 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1511 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB252 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4138/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4138/BILLS-115hr4138ih.pdf |