US SB2419 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-454.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-454.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Support Startup Businesses Act of 2018 This bill amends the Small Business Act to modify the technical assistance that is available under the Small Business Innovation Research (SBIR) and Small Business Technology Transfer (STTR) programs. Specifically, the bill: expands technical assistance under the SBIR and STTR programs to include specified assistance related to commercialization, modifies the limit on specified technical assistance under either program from $5,000 annually to 5% of the total award amount, and otherwise revises provisions related to the SBIR and STTR programs.
Title
Support Startup Businesses Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-454. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 352. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2789 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB2763 (Related) 2017-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB2763 (Related) 2017-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Subjects
Business records
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Intellectual property
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Technology transfer and commercialization
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Intellectual property
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Technology transfer and commercialization