US SB2401 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S706)
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S706)
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 Reform Act
Title
Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 Reform Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S706) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4481 (Related) 2017-11-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4690 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4705 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB652 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4393 (Related) 2017-11-14 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4522 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4615 (Related) 2017-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4822 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ethics, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4924 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2872 (Related) 2018-05-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 421.
SB2952 (Related) 2018-05-29 - Held at the desk.
HB6811 (Related) 2018-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3749 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
HB4690 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4705 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB652 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4393 (Related) 2017-11-14 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4522 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4615 (Related) 2017-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4822 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ethics, Oversight and Government Reform, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4924 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2872 (Related) 2018-05-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 421.
SB2952 (Related) 2018-05-29 - Held at the desk.
HB6811 (Related) 2018-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3749 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
China
Civil actions and liability
Computer security and identity theft
Congress
Congressional agencies
Congressional committees
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
House Committee on Ethics
House of Representatives
Human rights
Lawyers and legal services
Legislative rules and procedure
Library of Congress
Members of Congress
Policy sciences
Right of privacy
Rule of law and government transparency
Senate
Senate Select Committee on Ethics
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Worker safety and health
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
China
Civil actions and liability
Computer security and identity theft
Congress
Congressional agencies
Congressional committees
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
House Committee on Ethics
House of Representatives
Human rights
Lawyers and legal services
Legislative rules and procedure
Library of Congress
Members of Congress
Policy sciences
Right of privacy
Rule of law and government transparency
Senate
Senate Select Committee on Ethics
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2401/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2401/BILLS-115s2401is.pdf |