US SB2393 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish and carry out a comprehensive nationwide program to improve education and training for jobs in energy-related industries with existing or expected worker shortages. Emphasis shall be placed on increasing the number of skilled individuals from underrepresented groups trained to work in those jobs. DOE must establish an online resource center to maintain and update information and resources on training programs for such jobs; and as a resource for specified agencies, organizations, and apprenticeship programs working to develop and implement training programs for the jobs. The Department of Labor must provide grants to certain businesses or labor management organizations to pay the wages of employees when they are receiving training for jobs in the renewable energy, energy efficiency, grid modernization sectors or for reducing greenhouse gas emissions.
Title
Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-208. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 385. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Air quality
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of Energy
Disability and paralysis
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Minority education
Minority employment
Motor fuels
Science and engineering education
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Women's employment
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of Energy
Disability and paralysis
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Minority education
Minority employment
Motor fuels
Science and engineering education
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Women's employment