US SB2336 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve the management of information technology projects and investments of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Information Technology Reform Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-08-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4648-4650; text: CR S4648-4650) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 423. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Armed forces and national security
Budget process
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Armed forces and national security
Budget process
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement