US SB2330 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Empowering Olympic, Paralympic, and Amateur Athletes Act of 2020 This bill establishes safeguards to protect amateur athletes from abuse, including sexual abuse, by coaches and employees in U.S. Olympic and Paralympic sports. The bill establishes (1) legislative mechanisms by which Congress can dissolve the Board of Directors of the U.S. Olympic and Paralympic Committee (USOPC) and decertify national governing bodies; and (2) a duty of care that USOPC owes to amateur athletes, including protecting athletes by requiring it to ensure that any allegation of child abuse of an amateur athlete who is a minor is immediately reported to law enforcement. The bill revises duties of the Office of the Ombudsman regarding the pursuit of abuse claims by the U.S. Center for Safe Sport, confidentiality, and retaliation against an employee or member for disclosing information or seeking assistance in mediation. The USOPC and the national governing bodies shall not interfere in or attempt to influence the outcome of an investigation. The center shall report to Congress within 72 hours of an attempt to interfere in, or influence the outcome of, an investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowering Olympic, Paralympic, and Amateur Athletes Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-07HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-08-07HouseReceived in the House.
2020-08-07SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-08-04SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2020-08-04SenateS.Amdt.2512 Amendment SA 2512 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-08-04SenateS.Amdt.2512 Amendment SA 2512 proposed by Senator Moran. (consideration: CR S4696) In the nature of a substitute.
2020-08-04SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S4696)
2020-08-04SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4688-4696)
2020-07-29SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 503.
2020-07-29SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-245.
2019-11-13SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-07-30SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB3303 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB132 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB7881 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HCR118 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SCR46 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback