US SB132 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes within the legislative branch the Commission on the State of U.S. Olympics and Paralympics, which shall study matters relating to the state of U.S. participation in the Olympic and Paralympic games. Such study shall, among other things, include a description of proposed reforms to the structure of the U.S. Olympic Committee (USOC) and assessments of whether the board of the USOC includes diverse members, including athletes; U.S. athlete participation levels in the Olympics and Paralympics; whether the U.S. Center for Safe Sport effectively handles reported cases of bullying, hazing, harassment, and sexual assault; and the finances and the financial organization of the USOC.
Title
Strengthening U.S. Olympics Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3303 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2330 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-189. (TXT | PDF)
HB7881 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2330 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-189. (TXT | PDF)
HB7881 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Athletes
Congressional agencies
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Government studies and investigations
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Olympic games
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex offenses
Sports and recreation
Women's rights
Athletes
Congressional agencies
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Government studies and investigations
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Olympic games
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex offenses
Sports and recreation
Women's rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/132/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s132/BILLS-116s132is.pdf |