US SCR46 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution directs the Secretary of the Senate to make corrections in the enrollment of S. 2330 (Empowering Olympic, Paralympic, and Amateur Athletes Act of 2020). The resolution requires the U.S. Olympic and Paralympic Committee to make a mandatory $20 million payment on January 4, 2021, to the U.S. Center for Safe Sport for the center's operating costs for FY2021 and equivalent payments for subsequent fiscal years.
Title
A concurrent resolution to correct the enrollment of S. 2330.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-01 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5159) |
2020-10-01 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5159) |
2020-10-01 | House | Ms. Bass asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-09-24 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-09-24 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5825; text: CR S5837) |
Same As/Similar To
SB2330 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-189. (TXT | PDF)
HCR118 (Same As) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HCR118 (Same As) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.