US SB2311 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 46. Record Vote Number: 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 46. Record Vote Number: 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act This bill amends the federal criminal code to make it a crime for any person to perform or attempt to perform an abortion if the probable post-fertilization age of the fetus is 20 weeks or more. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, up to five years in prison, or both. The bill provides exceptions for an abortion: (1) that is necessary to save the life of the pregnant woman, or (2) when the pregnancy is the result of rape or incest. A physician who performs or attempts to perform an abortion under an exception must comply with specified requirements. A woman who undergoes a prohibited abortion may not be prosecuted for violating or conspiring to violate the provisions of this bill.
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 25 (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 46. Record Vote Number: 25. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S527-545) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S498) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S498) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 294. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB36 (Related) 2017-10-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1922 (Same As) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1922 (Same As) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Abortion
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Women's health
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Women's health