US SB2196 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

21st Century Buy American Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

21st Century Buy American Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB4812 (Same As) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB2284 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6907 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback