US HB6907 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BuyAmerican.gov Act of 2018
Title
BuyAmerican.gov Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4812 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB2196 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2284 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2196 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2284 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6907/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6907/BILLS-115hr6907ih.pdf |