US HB4812 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
21st Century Buy American Act
Title
21st Century Buy American Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2196 (Same As) 2017-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2284 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6907 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2284 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6907 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4812/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4812/BILLS-115hr4812ih.pdf |