US SB2143 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-163. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-163. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the authority for the successors and assigns of the Starr-Camargo Bridge Company to maintain and operate a toll bridge across the Rio Grande near Rio Grande City, Texas, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill modifies the existing authority for the Starr-Camargo Bridge Company to maintain and operate a toll bridge across the Rio Grande River near Rio Grande City, Texas. The authority, which currently expires 66 years after completion of the bridge (in 1966), is made permanent and expanded to include the successors or assigns of the company. The bridge must not consist of more than 14 lanes. The company and its successors and assigns shall have the rights and privileges granted by federal law to the B and P Bridge Company, and may use eminent domain to acquire certain land needed for the bridge, subject to Texas laws and requirements for just compensation and public proceedings. The company's successors and assigns may fix and charge tolls for transit over the bridge. Those successors and assigns may also sell, assign, transfer, or mortgage the rights, powers, and privileges conferred on the company by the enacting law, to any public agency, to an international bridge authority or commission, or to a corporation. Any such corporation may exercise such rights, powers, and privileges (including acquisition by mortgage foreclosure) as if they had been granted by the enacting law directly to the corporation.
Title
A bill to provide for the authority for the successors and assigns of the Starr-Camargo Bridge Company to maintain and operate a toll bridge across the Rio Grande near Rio Grande City, Texas, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-163. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-05-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-05-18 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-05-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2397-2398) |
2016-05-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2143. |
2016-05-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2397-2399) |
2016-05-16 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-04-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2016-03-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1606; text as passed Senate: CR S1606) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 374. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. With written report No. 114-213. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7161) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3688 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Subjects
Latin America
Mexico
Public contracts and procurement
Roads and highways
Texas
Transportation and public works
Mexico
Public contracts and procurement
Roads and highways
Texas
Transportation and public works