US SB2090 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6976-6977)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6976-6977)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social Security Earned Benefits Payment Act This bill amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to require allocations to the Federal Disability Insurance Trust Fund equal to: (1) 2.65% of the amount of wages and self-employment income paid between December 31, 2015, and January 1, 2021; and (2) 1.80% of wages and self-employment income paid after December 31, 2020.
Title
Social Security Earned Benefits Payment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6976-6977) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3621 (Same As) 2015-09-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Subjects
Appropriations
Disability assistance
Government trust funds
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
Disability assistance
Government trust funds
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2090/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2090/BILLS-114s2090is.pdf |