US SB208 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PACE Act Promoting Affordable Childcare for Everyone Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax credit for expenses for household and dependent care services necessary for gainful employment (known as the Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit), to: (1) make the credit refundable, (2) increase the rate for the credit, and (3) require the dollar amounts for such credit to be adjusted for inflation after 2017. The bill also increases the amount of employer-provided dependent care assistance which may be excluded from the gross income of an employee and requires the increased exclusion amount to be adjusted for inflation after 2018.
Title
PACE Act Promoting Affordable Childcare for Everyone Act
Sponsors
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB782 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2238 (Related) 2017-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3632 (Same As) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2238 (Related) 2017-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3632 (Same As) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Child care and development
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Inflation and prices
Taxation
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax credits
Income tax exclusion
Inflation and prices
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/208/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s208/BILLS-115s208is.pdf |