US SB2042 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - By Senator Cardin from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 117-104. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - By Senator Cardin from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 117-104. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the Interagency Committee on Women's Business Enterprise, and for other purposes.
Title
Interagency Committee on Women’s Business Enterprise Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | By Senator Cardin from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 117-104. Minority views filed. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 279. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Cardin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3875 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.