US SB2040 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-232.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-232.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Blackfoot River Land Exchange Act of 2014 - (Sec. 4) Extinguishes all claims and all right, title, and interest in specified Indian and non-Indian land as part of the settlement of disputes within the Fort Hall Indian Reservation of the Shoshone-Bannock Indian Tribes in Idaho resulting from the realignment of the Blackfoot River by the Corps of Engineers in 1964. (Sec. 5) Requires the non-Indian land to be held in trust by the United States for the Tribes. (Sec. 6) Directs the Secretary of the Interior to transfer the Indian land to the Blackfoot River Flood Control District No. 7 for use or sale. Requires any proceeds from the sale of the land to be used to compensate: (1) each non-Indian landowner at fair market value for his or her loss of land resulting from this Act's implementation, and (2) the Blackfoot River Flood Control District No. 7 for any expenses it incurs in carrying out this Act. Authorizes the Blackfoot River Flood Control District No. 7 to dispose of the land or proceeds that remain in any manner it determines to be appropriate.
Title
Blackfoot River Land Exchange Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 414 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-16 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-232. |
2014-12-16 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-12-08 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-12-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 534). (text: CR 12/1/2014 H8187-8188) |
2014-12-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8237-8238) |
2014-12-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-12-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2040. |
2014-12-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8187-8188) |
2014-12-01 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-09-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-09-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-09-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | S.AMDT.3932 Amendment SA 3932 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | S.AMDT.3932 Amendment SA 3932 proposed by Senator Pryor for Senator Crapo. (consideration: CR S5872-5873; text: CR S5872-5873)In the nature of a substitute. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5872-5873) |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 530. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester without amendment. With written report No. 113-242. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5049 (Same As) 2014-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 479.
Subjects
Floods and storm protection
Idaho
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Idaho
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans