US SB1944 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to evaluate productivity expectations for readjustment counselors of Vet Centers, including by obtaining feedback from counselors that must be audited annually for five years by the Government Accountability Office. The VA must also (1) develop and implement a staffing model for Vet Centers, (2) standardize descriptions of position responsibilities at Vet Centers, and (3) award grants to address food insecurity among veterans and family members of veterans who receive services through Vet Centers or other VA facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vet Center Improvement Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-15SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-10-20SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
2021-05-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3900-3901)

Same As/Similar To

HB3575 (Same As) 2021-05-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback