US SB1936 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for extensions of the time limitations for use of entitlement under Department of Veterans Affairs educational assistance programs by reason of school closures due to emergency and other situations, and for other purposes.
Title
GI Bill National Emergency Extended Deadline Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2945 (Related) 2021-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB2167 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2391 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB1935 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1095 (Related) 2021-11-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-68.
HB2167 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2391 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB1935 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1095 (Related) 2021-11-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-68.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1936/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1936/BILLS-117s1936is.pdf |