US SB1095 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-68.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-68.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the disapproval by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs of courses of education offered by public institutions of higher learning that do not charge veterans the in-State tuition rate for purposes of Survivors' and Dependents' Educational Assistance Program, and for other purposes.
Title
Colonel John M. McHugh Tuition Fairness for Survivors Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 424 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-68. |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2021-11-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 373). (text: CR H6256) |
2021-11-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6257-6258) |
2021-11-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-11-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1095. |
2021-11-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6255-6257) |
2021-11-15 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-06-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-06-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4796) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4796) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2457 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB2167 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1936 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
HB2167 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1936 (Related) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.