US SB1757 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the President pro tempore of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives to arrange for the award of a single gold medal to the U.S. Army Ranger veterans of World War II in recognition of their dedicated wartime service. Following its award, the gold medal shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution where it shall be available for display and research.
Title
United States Army Rangers Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-03-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1609-1610) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.1524 Amendment SA 1524 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.1524 Amendment SA 1524 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Ernst. (consideration: CR S1611; text: CR S1609-1610) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1611) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5002 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Veterans' organizations and recognition